Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Takáts

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa

Titular Bishop of Belline


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Nov 1732³BornGyöngös
14 Oct 175017.9ProfessedMember of Society of Jesus
1 Sep 176431.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Society of Jesus
2 Sep 176431.8Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
2 Feb 176835.2Solemn ProfessedPriest of Society of Jesus
3 Aug 180774.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary
3 Aug 180774.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Belline
17 Jan 181885.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martin Takáts:
Bishop Martin Takáts (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Kalocsa

  • a priest for 53.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013