Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gyula Czapik

Deceased

Archbishop of Eger, Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1887Born
14 Jul 191022.6Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jul 193951.6AppointedBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
27 Aug 193951.7Ordained BishopBishop of Veszprém, Hungary
7 May 194355.4AppointedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
25 Apr 195668.3DiedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Gyula Czapik
Archbishop Gyula Czapik (born , died ) Archbishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSzeged
Ordained BishopUniversity, Church, Budapest

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1939, Number 44
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 21, Number 1,130
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 76, Number 6,122

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast