Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Szeged-Csanád

Dioecesis Szegediensis-Csanadiensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • László Kiss-Rigó, Bishop
  • Endre Gyulay, Bishop Emeritus

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Csanád
1035ErectedDiocese of Csanád (erected)
19 June 1931ElevatedDiocese of Csanád (See Transferred)
Diocese of Szeged-Csanád
5 August 1982Name ChangedDiocese of Csanád Diocese of Szeged-Csanád
31 May 1993Territory LostArchdiocese of Eger
Diocese of Szeged-Csanád
Diocese of Debrecen-Nyíregyháza (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Csanád
1950265,000350,00075.7%134541881,4098637559ap1951
1969371,7501,370,30027.1%2082081,78753113ap1971
1980376,0001,576,00023.9%1531532,45716113ap1981
Diocese of Szeged-Csanád
1990381,0881,050,42436.3%1281282,977111ap1991
1999440,000936,00047.0%103191223,606210113112ap2000
2000440,000936,00047.0%101191203,66636913112ap2001
2001440,000936,00047.0%101191203,66647016112ap2002
2002440,000936,00047.0%101191203,66636420112ap2003
2003440,000936,00047.0%104191233,57747730130ap2004
2004440,000936,00047.0%98191173,76047529129ap2005
2010360,563881,15940.9%103131163,10836030112ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 15 Apr 2014