Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop József Bánk

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Vác


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jan 1911BornAdács
21 Jun 193625.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Sep 196453.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Győr (Raab), Hungary
15 Sep 196453.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Materiana
28 Oct 196453.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Materiana
10 Jan 196958.0AppointedBishop of Vác, Hungary
2 Feb 197463.0AppointedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
2 Mar 197867.1AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Vác, Hungary
3 Mar 198776.1RetiredBishop of Vác, Hungary
7 Sep 200291.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Vác, Hungary

MicroData Summary for József Bánk:
Archbishop József Bánk (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Vác

  • a priest for 66.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013