Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop György Fenessy

Deceased

Bishop of Eger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1629BornIaurien
1 Oct 168556.7AppointedBishop of Csanád, Hungary
12 May 168758.3AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
4 Mar 169970.1DiedBishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for György Fenessy:
Bishop György Fenessy (died ) Bishop of Eger

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 73, and Page 177

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015