Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop János Pyber de Gyerkény

Deceased

Bishop of Eger


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Jul 1611SelectedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
29 Jul 1613ConfirmedBishop of Pécs, Hungary
6 Jul 1614Ordained BishopBishop of Pécs, Hungary
1619SelectedBishop of Oradea Mare {Gran Varadino, Nagyvárad}, Romania
21 Oct 1625SelectedBishop of Eger, Hungary
7 Apr 1631ConfirmedBishop of Eger, Hungary
Oct 1633³DiedBishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for János Pyber de Gyerkény:
Bishop János Pyber de Gyerkény , Bishop of Eger

  • a bishop for 19.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 73, and Page 290
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 358, and Page 377
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1614, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015