Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pavol Brezanóczy

Deceased

Archbishop of Eger


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1912BornSlatinské Lazy, Slovakia
28 Jul 193523.5Ordained PriestPriest
195946.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Eger, Hungary
15 Sep 196452.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rotaria
28 Oct 196452.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rotaria
10 Jan 196957.0AppointedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary
11 Feb 197260.0DiedArchbishop of Eger, Hungary

MicroData Summary for Pavol Brezanóczy:
Archbishop Pavol Brezanóczy (born , died ) Archbishop of Eger

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 7.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013