Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gabriele Cardinal Rangone, O.F.M. Obs. †

Deceased

Bishop of Eger, Hungary

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Sergio e Bacco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1415¹Born
1447²32.0EnteredMember of Order of Observant Friars Minor
16 Dec 147257.9AppointedBishop of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
24 Apr 147560.3AppointedBishop of Eger, Hungary
10 Dec 147762.9Elevated to Cardinal
12 Dec 147762.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Sergio e Bacco
27 Sep 148671.7DiedBishop of Eger, Hungary

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gabriele Rangone (VIAF: 265132120)
Gabriele Cardinal Rangone O.F.M. Obs. (born 1415, died ) Bishop of Eger

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChiari, Diocese of Brescia, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)S. Bonaventura Chapel, S. Maria in Aracoeli, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a cardinal for 8.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 10 Dec 1477
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 254, and Page 82
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1472, Number 53*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 12 Nov 2018

Quantcast