Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bl. Alfredo Ildefonso Cardinal Schuster, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1880Born
13 Nov 190020.8ProfessedMember of Order of Saint Benedict
19 Mar 190424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
6 Apr 191838.2AppointedAbbot of San Paolo fuori le Mura, Italy
26 Jun 192949.4AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
15 Jul 192949.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 Jul 192949.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
21 Jul 192949.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
30 Aug 195474.6DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
12 May 1996Beatified

MicroData Summary for Bl. Alfredo Ildefonso Schuster (VIAF: 3597226)
Bl. Alfredo Ildefonso Cardinal Schuster O.S.B. (born , died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceVenegono Inferiore, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSistine Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 50.4 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
  • a cardinal for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/beat: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia, Volume 17, Page 666
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1929, Number 57
  • loc: AT, 29 Dec 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016