Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ferdinando Maggioni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1914Born
26 Jul 193622.4Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Sep 196753.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
14 Sep 196753.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Subaugusta
29 Oct 196753.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Subaugusta
17 Jul 198066.4AppointedBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
4 Oct 198066.6InstalledBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
22 Apr 198975.2RetiredBishop of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy
2 Dec 199884.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia), Italy

MicroData Summary for Ferdinando Maggioni (VIAF: 254717587)
Bishop Ferdinando Maggioni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alessandria (della Paglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMonza, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained PriestGallarate, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopDuomo, Monza, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Cemetery, Monza, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 62.3 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • loc: AM, 18 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast