Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Obert, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Dinajpur

Titular Bishop of Abziri


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1890BornLignod di Ayas, Italy
3 Apr 191525.0Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
9 Dec 194858.7AppointedBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
6 Feb 194958.8Ordained BishopBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
5 Sep 196878.4RetiredBishop of Dinajpur, Bangladesh
5 Sep 196878.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Abziri
6 Mar 197281.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Dinajpur, Bangladesh

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Obert:
Bishop Giuseppe Obert P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Dinajpur

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013