Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Mascheroni

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

Titular Bishop of Forum Flaminii


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1929 BornSesto San Giovanni
7 Jun 195222.6Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
9 Jun 199060.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
9 Jun 199060.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Forum Flaminii
24 Jun 199060.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Forum Flaminii
10 Jan 200575.2RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Angelo Mascheroni:
Bishop Angelo Mascheroni (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 125, Number 11,283
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015