Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rodolfo Orler, F.S.C.J. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal

Titular Bishop of Prusias ad Hypium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Nov 1892BornVulcan, USA
23 Dec 191624.1Ordained PriestPriest of Sons of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
11 Dec 193341.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal, Sudan
11 Dec 193341.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Prusias ad Hypium
7 Feb 193441.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Prusias ad Hypium
19 Jul 194653.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal, Sudan

MicroData Summary for Rodolfo Orler:
Bishop Rodolfo Orler F.S.C.J. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Bahr el-Ghazal

  • a priest for 29.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 13

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013