Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Egidio Bignamini

Deceased

Archbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1887Born
21 May 191022.7Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
18 Nov 194558.2AppointedArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
2 Dec 194558.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy
21 Dec 196679.3DiedArchbishop of Ancona e Numana, Italy

MicroData Summary for Egidio Bignamini
Archbishop Egidio Bignamini (born , died ) Archbishop of Ancona e Numana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cristina di Bissone

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 64

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 19 Feb 2018