Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Grassi, P.I.M.E. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vijayawada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Aug 1887BornMilano, Italy
11 Jun 191123.8Ordained PriestPriest of Pontifical Institute for Foreign Missions
11 Nov 193346.3AppointedSuperior of Bezwada, India
13 Apr 193749.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bezwada, India
3 Dec 193851.3AppointedBishop of Bezwada, India
1 May 193951.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bezwada, India
9 May 195163.8DiedBishop of Vijayawada, India

MicroData Summary for Domenico Grassi:
Bishop Domenico Grassi P.I.M.E. (born , died ) Bishop of Vijayawada

  • a priest for 39.9 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 22

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013