Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Libero Tresoldi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Crema, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1921Born
29 May 194322.3Ordained PriestPriest of Milano {Milan}, Italy
28 Sep 197049.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
28 Sep 197049.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Altinum
22 Nov 197049.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Altinum
10 Dec 198160.8AppointedBishop of Crema, Italy
7 Feb 198261.0InstalledBishop of Crema, Italy
11 Jul 199675.4RetiredBishop of Crema, Italy
22 Oct 200988.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Crema, Italy

MicroData Summary for Libero Tresoldi (VIAF: 233052429)
Bishop Libero Tresoldi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Crema

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRivolta d'Adda, Diocese of Cremona
Ordained PriestCathedral, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopSant'Ambrogio, Basilica, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Crema, Diocese of Crema

  • a priest for 66.3 years
  • a bishop for 38.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)
  • loc: AM, 25 Feb 2018
  • i/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 7 Aug 2018

Quantcast