Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vitale Bonifacio Bertoli, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Tripoli, Libya

Titular Bishop of Attaea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1898Born
20 Dec 192426.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
20 Feb 194849.9AppointedPrefect of Misurata, Libya
5 Apr 195153.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tripoli, Libya
5 Apr 195153.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Attaea
20 May 195153.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Attaea
10 Mar 196769.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Tripoli, Libya

MicroData Summary for Vitale Bonifacio Bertoli
Bishop Vitale Bonifacio Bertoli O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Tripoli

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLumezzane, Italy

  • a priest for 42.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 48

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast