Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giulio Oggioni

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1916BornVillasanta
3 Jun 193922.9Ordained PriestPriest of Lodi, Italy
28 Sep 197256.2AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
4 Nov 197256.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lodi, Italy
20 May 197760.9AppointedBishop of Bergamo, Italy
21 Nov 199175.4RetiredBishop of Bergamo, Italy
26 Feb 199376.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Bergamo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giulio Oggioni
Bishop Giulio Oggioni (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bergamo

  • a priest for 53.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 31 Aug 2016