Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Marcantonio Cardinal Franciotti

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lucca

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1592²BornLucca
28 Nov 163341.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
30 Mar 163745.2AppointedBishop of Lucca, Italy
30 Mar 163745.2Elevated to Cardinal
19 Apr 163745.2Ordained BishopBishop of Lucca, Italy
17 Aug 163745.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
19 Dec 163947.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria della Pace
31 Jul 164553.5ResignedBishop of Lucca, Italy
8 Feb 166674.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Lucca, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Marcantonio Franciotti:
Marcantonio Cardinal Franciotti (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lucca

  • a bishop for 28.8 years
  • a cardinal for 32.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 28 Nov 1633
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 24, and Page 223
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 99, Number 594
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1637, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 6 Apr 2015