Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfonso Cardinal Gesualdo di Conza (Gonza)

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Prefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Oct 1540Born
26 Feb 156120.3Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 156120.3InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Santa Cecilia
14 Apr 156120.4AppointedAdministrator of Conza, Italy
22 Oct 156323.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
1 Mar 156423.3AppointedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
23 Apr 156423.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Conza, Italy
17 Oct 157231.9AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prisca
19 Nov 157232.0ResignedArchbishop of Conza, Italy
9 Jul 157837.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
17 Aug 157938.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
5 Dec 158040.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
4 Mar 158342.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
2 Dec 158747.1AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Frascati
22 Jan 158847.2AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of (Sacred) Rites
2 Mar 158948.3AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
20 Mar 159150.4AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
12 Feb 159655.3AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
14 Feb 160362.3DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Gesualdo di Conza (Gonza) (VIAF: 1184904)
Alfonso Cardinal Gesualdo di Conza (Gonza) (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalitri, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}
Buried Place (Current)S. Restituta, Church, Napoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a bishop for 38.8 years
  • a cardinal for 41.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 176, Number 14,629
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 255, and Page 175
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1564, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 6 May 2018

Quantcast