Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Didier Palleti, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1587¹BornVerceil
28 Nov 164457.9AppointedBishop of Nice, France
18 Dec 164457.9Ordained BishopBishop of Nice, France
18 Sep 165871.7DiedBishop of Nice, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Didier Palleti:
Bishop Didier Palleti C.R.L. (died ) Bishop of Nice

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 258
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 109, Number 661
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1644, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 22 Mar 2015