Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paolo Piromalli, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bisignano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹BornSiderno en Calabre
14 Jun 165564.4AppointedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
4 Jul 165564.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
15 Dec 166473.9AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Bisignano, Italy
12 Jul 166776.5DiedBishop of Bisignano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Piromalli:
Archbishop Paolo Piromalli O.P. (born 1591, died ) Bishop of Bisignano

  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 118, Number 719
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 253, and Page 115
  • bp/bd/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1655, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015