Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Jacobio (Giacomo)

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Policastro, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1652AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
29 Sep 1652Ordained BishopBishop of Policastro, Italy
17 Apr 1671ResignedBishop of Policastro, Italy
6 Mar 1687DiedBishop Emeritus of Policastro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Filippo Jacobio (Giacomo)
Bishop Filippo Jacobio (Giacomo) (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Policastro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMessanae

  • a bishop for 34.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 115, Number 702
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 284
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,652, Number 27

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast