Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedetto Geraci

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1590¹BornGerace
19 Dec 165060.9AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
8 Jan 165161.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
18 Aug 166070.6DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Benedetto Geraci:
Bishop Benedetto Geraci (died ) Bishop of Lipari

  • a bishop for 9.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 222
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1651, Number 2

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015