Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Pinelli, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga


Events

DateEventTitle
18 May 1648AppointedBishop of Molfetta, Italy
24 May 1648Ordained BishopBishop of Molfetta, Italy
29 Mar 1666AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
Jun 1688³DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Tommaso Pinelli:
Bishop Giovanni Tommaso Pinelli C.R. , Bishop of Albenga

  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 76, and Page 238
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 26 Mar 2015