Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Faustus Cardinal Poli

Deceased

Bishop of Orvieto

Cardinal-Priest of San Crisogono


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1581BornUsigni
14 Mar 163352.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
25 Jul 163352.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Amasea
13 Jul 164362.4Elevated to Cardinal
31 Aug 164362.5InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Crisogono
23 May 164463.2AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Orvieto, Italy
7 Oct 165372.6DiedBishop of Orvieto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Faustus Poli:
Faustus Cardinal Poli (born , died ) Bishop of Orvieto

  • a bishop for 20.2 years
  • a cardinal for 10.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Jul 1643
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 80
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 93, Number 558
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1633, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 20 Mar 2015