Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Guillaume Cardinal d’Estouteville, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Rouen

Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)

Bishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1403BornNormandy
20 Feb 143936.1SelectedBishop of Angers, France
30 Mar 143936.2ConfirmedBishop of Angers, France
18 Apr 143936.3AppointedAdministrator of Mirepoix, France
25 Sep 143936.7AppointedBishop of Digne, France
18 Dec 143937.0Elevated to Cardinal
8 Jan 144037.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Santi Silvestro e Martino ai Monti
10 Jan 144037.0Ordained BishopBishop of Digne, France
17 May 144138.4AppointedAdministrator of Nîmes, France
10 Jul 144441.5AppointedAdministrator of Béziers, France
11 Sep 144542.7ResignedBishop of Digne, France
26 Jul 144744.6ResignedAdministrator of Béziers, France
27 Oct 144744.8ResignedBishop of Angers, France
7 Jan 145047.0ResignedAdministrator of Nîmes, France
7 Jan 145047.0AppointedAdministrator of Lodève, France
26 Jan 145350.1AppointedBishop of Saint-Jean-de-Maurienne, France
20 Apr 145350.3AppointedArchbishop of Rouen, France
145451.0AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Porto e Santa Rufina
26 Oct 146158.8AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Ostia (e Velletri)
22 Jan 148380.1DiedArchbishop of Rouen, France

MicroData Summary for Guillaume d’Estouteville:
Cardinal Guillaume d’Estouteville O.S.B. (died ) Archbishop of Rouen

  • a bishop for 43.0 years
  • a cardinal for 43.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 18 Dec 1439
  • ob/c2?: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,877

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013