Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Teodoro Balbo

Deceased

Archbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1608¹Born
18 Sep 165648.7AppointedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
5 Nov 165648.8Ordained BishopArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia
19 May 166961.3DiedArchbishop of Zadar (Zara), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Balbo
Archbishop Teodoro Balbo (born 1608, died ) Archbishop of Zadar (Zara)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Ordained BishopSant’Ambrogio della Massima, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceVenezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)San Gregorio, Church, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}, Italy

  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 207
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 41
  • ob/c2+: AT, 13 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 14 Nov 2018

Quantcast