Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Boncore

Deceased

Bishop of Lavello, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
13 May 1652AppointedBishop of Lavello, Italy
21 May 1652Ordained BishopBishop of Lavello, Italy
23 Jun 1687DiedBishop of Lavello, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Boncore
Bishop Giuseppe Boncore (died ) Bishop of Lavello

  • a bishop for 35.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 114, Number 698
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast