Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Laudivio Cardinal Zacchia

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1565²BornCastle of Vezzano
17 Aug 160540.6AppointedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
28 Aug 160540.6Ordained BishopBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
12 May 162156.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
16 Dec 162358.9ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Venice, Italy
19 Jan 162661.0Elevated to Cardinal
9 Feb 162661.1InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
17 Sep 162964.7AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
13 May 163065.3ResignedBishop of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy
30 Aug 163772.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Laudivio Zacchia (VIAF: 89739941)
Laudivio Cardinal Zacchia (born 1565, died ) Bishop Emeritus of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone

  • a bishop for 32.0 years
  • a cardinal for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 19 Jan 1626
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 247, and Page 20
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1605, Number 14
  • nunc: Les Nonciatures Apostoliques Permanentes, Page 292

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 18 Oct 2016