Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mauro Promontorio, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ventimiglia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1622BornSarzana
22 Jun 165432.0AppointedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
24 Jun 165432.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy
4 Jan 168562.6DiedBishop of Ventimiglia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Mauro Promontorio:
Bishop Mauro Promontorio O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Ventimiglia

  • a bishop for 30.5 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,377
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 363
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1654, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015