Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paolo Squillanti

Deceased

Bishop of Teano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1584¹BornNapoli
7 Dec 165470.9AppointedBishop of Teano, Italy
13 Dec 165470.9Ordained BishopBishop of Teano, Italy
2 Jan 166076.0DiedBishop of Teano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Paolo Squillanti:
Bishop Paolo Squillanti (died ) Bishop of Teano

  • a bishop for 5.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 117, Number 715
  • Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 331

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015