Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francesco Cardinal Cherubini

Deceased

Bishop of Senigallia

Cardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1585BornMontalboddo
7 Oct 164762.8Elevated to Cardinal
16 Dec 164763.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Giovanni a Porta Latina
2 Aug 165570.6AppointedBishop of Senigallia, Italy
8 Aug 165570.6Ordained BishopBishop of Senigallia, Italy
24 Apr 165671.3DiedBishop of Senigallia, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cherubini:
Cardinal Francesco Cherubini (died ) Bishop of Senigallia

  • a bishop for .7 years
  • a cardinal for 8.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 7 Oct 1647
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 312

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013