Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stefano Quaranta, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Amalfi, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Oct 1649AppointedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
21 Nov 1649Ordained BishopArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy
30 Nov 1678DiedArchbishop of Amalfi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Stefano Quaranta
Archbishop Stefano Quaranta C.R. (died ) Archbishop of Amalfi

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Andre della Valle, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 29.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 80
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1649, Number 18
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 77, Number 6,185

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast