Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Attilio Pietrasanta, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vigevano


Events

DateEventTitle
2 Feb 1659SelectedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
28 Jul 1659ConfirmedBishop of Vigevano, Italy
17 Aug 1659Ordained BishopBishop of Vigevano, Italy
7 Nov 1666DiedBishop of Vigevano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Attilio Pietrasanta:
Bishop Attilio Pietrasanta O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Vigevano

  • a bishop for 7.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 121, Number 738
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 369
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1659, Number 24

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015