Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philibert Milliet de Faverges, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ivrea, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1606¹Born
16 Oct 165650.7AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
27 Dec 1656³50.9Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
29 Jul 165852.5AppointedBishop of Ivrea, Italy
24 Nov 165852.8InstalledBishop of Ivrea, Italy
15 Sep 166357.7DiedBishop of Ivrea, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Philibert Milliet de Faverges
Bishop Philibert Milliet de Faverges C.R.L. (born 1606, died ) Bishop of Ivrea

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTorino, Archdiocese of Torino {Turin}
Ordained BishopBorghese Chapel, Santa Maria Maggiore, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 6.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 100, and Page 211
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1656, Number 23
  • ob/c2: AT, 4 Nov 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 6 Nov 2018

Quantcast