Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Díaz de Encinas, O. Carm. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ugento


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Mar 1599³BornToledo, Spain
18 Nov 165758.7SelectedBishop of Ugento, Italy
28 Jul 165960.4ConfirmedBishop of Ugento, Italy
17 Aug 165960.5Ordained BishopBishop of Ugento, Italy
23 Nov 166061.7DiedBishop of Ugento, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Díaz de Encinas:
Bishop Lorenzo Díaz de Encinas O. Carm. (died ) Bishop of Ugento

  • a bishop for 1.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 121, Number 738
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 351
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 190, Number 1,193

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Nov 2013