Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Girolamo Borghese, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Pienza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1616Born
11 Dec 165236.9AppointedBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
29 Dec 165236.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana (Soana), Italy
17 Dec 166852.9AppointedBishop of Pienza, Italy
15 Jan 169882.0DiedBishop of Pienza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Girolamo Borghese
Bishop Girolamo Borghese O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Pienza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSienna
Ordained BishopSan Ignazio, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 45.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 314
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 323
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 34
  • c3: AT, 18 Oct 2016
  • b/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,141

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast