Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alessandro Porro, C.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1600¹BornMilan
5 Dec 165050.9AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
21 Dec 165050.9Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
15 Sep 166060.7DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alessandro Porro:
Bishop Alessandro Porro C.R. (died ) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a bishop for 9.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 117
  • ob/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1650, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 25 Mar 2015