Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Michele Beggiami (Beggiamo)

Deceased

Archbishop of Torino {Turin}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Sep 1611BornSavigliano
29 May 165644.7AppointedBishop of Mondovi, Italy
21 Aug 166250.9AppointedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy
Oct 1689³78.0DiedArchbishop of Torino {Turin}, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Michele Beggiami (Beggiamo):
Archbishop Michele Beggiami (Beggiamo) (born ) Archbishop of Torino {Turin}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 249, and Page 329

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013