Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gianlucido Palombara

Deceased

Bishop of Pesaro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1617¹BornRoma
1 Apr 165841.2AppointedBishop of Pesaro, Italy
7 Apr 165841.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pesaro, Italy
25 Nov 166649.8DiedBishop of Pesaro, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gianlucido Palombara:
Bishop Gianlucido Palombara (born 1617, died ) Bishop of Pesaro

  • a bishop for 8.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 120, Number 732
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 281
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1658, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015