Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Montefiascone

Dioecesis Faliscodunensis o Montis Falisci

United

To: Diocese of Viterbo, Acquapendente, Bagnoregio, Montefiascone, Tuscania e San Martino al Monte Cimino



Show: All | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Historical Details


Past Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Montefiascone
14th CenturyErectedDiocese of Montefiascone (erected)
Diocese of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone
5 December 1435Name ChangedDiocese of Montefiascone Diocese of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone
Diocese of Montefiascone
14 June 1854SplitDiocese of Corneto (Tarquinia) e Montefiascone
Diocese of Civitavecchia
Diocese of Montefiascone
Diocese of Tarquinia e Civitavecchia
27 March 1986UnitedDiocese of Acquapendente
Diocese of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea)
Diocese of Montefiascone
Diocese of Viterbo e Tuscania
Diocese of Viterbo, Acquapendente, Bagnoregio, Montefiascone, Tuscania e San Martino al Monte Cimino

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Montefiascone
195040,00040,000100.0%5019695792915021ap1951
197034,166.0%409490131720ap1971
198034,17834,188100.0%459546321310220ap1981

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 27 May 2014