Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Annibale Sillano

Deceased

Bishop of Castro di Puglia


Events

DateEventTitle
1627¹Ordained PriestPriest
6 Oct 1653AppointedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
12 Oct 1653Ordained BishopBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy
12 Feb 1666³DiedBishop of Castro di Puglia, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Annibale Sillano:
Bishop Annibale Sillano (died ) Bishop of Castro di Puglia

  • a priest for 39.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 116, Number 707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 139

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013