Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Granafei

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1605¹BornMesagne
9 Jun 165348.4AppointedBishop of Alessano, Italy
22 Jun 165348.5Ordained BishopBishop of Alessano, Italy
11 Oct 166661.8AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
18 Mar 1683³78.2DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Granafei:
Archbishop Giovanni Granafei (died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a bishop for 29.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 115, Number 705
  • Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 77, and Page 110

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013