Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Ciantes, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marsico Nuovo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1602¹BornRoma
5 Mar 164038.1AppointedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
19 Mar 164038.2Ordained BishopBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
Jan 165654.0ResignedBishop of Marsico Nuovo, Italy
24 Feb 167068.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Marsico Nuovo, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Ciantes:
Bishop Giuseppe Ciantes O.P. (died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marsico Nuovo

  • a bishop for 29.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 233
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 105, Number 634
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1640, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 28 Mar 2015