Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Teodoro Fantoni, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)


Events

DateEventTitle
19 Feb 1652AppointedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
3 Mar 1652Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy
27 Jul 1684DiedBishop of San Marco (Argentano), Italy

MicroData Summary for Teodoro Fantoni:
Bishop Teodoro Fantoni C.R.L. (died ) Bishop of San Marco (Argentano)

  • a bishop for 32.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 231
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1652, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 18 Apr 2015