Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincenzo Lanfranchi, C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1609¹BornNapoli
5 May 166051.3AppointedBishop of Trivento, Italy
17 May 166051.3Ordained BishopBishop of Trivento, Italy
7 Dec 166556.9AppointedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy
6 Sep 167667.6DiedArchbishop of Acerenza e Matera, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Lanfranchi:
Archbishop Vincenzo Lanfranchi C.R. (died ) Archbishop of Acerenza e Matera

  • a bishop for 16.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 122, Number 744
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 345, and Page 67
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1660, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015