Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Dennis Joseph Cardinal Dougherty

Deceased

Archbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania

Cardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Aug 1865BornHomesville, PA
31 May 189024.8Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
12 Jun 190337.8AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
14 Jun 190337.8Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
21 Jun 190842.8AppointedBishop of Jaro, Philippines
9 Dec 191550.3AppointedBishop of Buffalo, New York, USA
1 May 191852.7AppointedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
10 Jul 191852.9InstalledArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
7 Mar 192155.6Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 192155.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Nereo ed Achilleo
31 May 195185.8DiedArchbishop of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Dennis Joseph Dougherty:
Cardinal Dennis Joseph Dougherty (born , died ) Archbishop of Philadelphia

  • a priest for 61.0 years
  • a bishop for 48.0 years
  • a cardinal for 30.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 419
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 15
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 95

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013