Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Agustín Pedro Blaquier, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Oct 1749BornBarcelona, Spain
19 Sep 177323.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of St. Augustine
20 Jul 180151.7AppointedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
20 Feb 180353.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
31 Dec 180354.2DiedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Agustín Pedro Blaquier:
Bishop Agustín Pedro Blaquier O.S.A. (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Segovia

  • a priest for 30.2 years
  • a bishop for .8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1803, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 287
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 123, Number 653
  • bd/op: CB, 24 Jul 2014
  • bd/op: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015