Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Juan de Arechederra, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop-Elect of Nueva Segovia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1681³BornCaracas
17 Sep 174968.1SelectedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
19 Jan 175068.4ConfirmedBishop of Nueva Segovia, Philippines
12 Nov 175170.3DiedBishop-Elect of Nueva Segovia, Philippines

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Arechederra:
Father Juan de Arechederra O.P. (born , died ) Bishop-Elect of Nueva Segovia

Source(s):
  • b: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 107
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1750, Number 43
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015